This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 17:54:11 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. - v. - JAMES HILLEN

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JAMES HILLEN. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

James Hillen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

AFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1161090

AFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE #: 1161090

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE #: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1161090

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1161090

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1161090

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1161090

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE #: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1161090; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less