This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 02:19:48 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA - v. - DOTAN POLLAK

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against DOTAN POLLAK. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

Dotan Pollak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUGHES, ADAM MICHAEL

Attorney at MALEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 19, 2017

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 19, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 19, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less