This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 18:26:25 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. - v. - BRIAN L GEER

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN L GEER. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Brian L Geer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

NOTICE *Corrected* Administrative Review to the Court

NOTICE *Corrected* Administrative Review to the Court; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet

ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/24/2018; Received: 12/24/2018

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/24/2018; Received: 12/24/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE *Corrected* Administrative Review to the Court; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less