This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 09:51:36 (UTC).

Camille A. Melkun - v. - Kenneth A. McLeod

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 Camille A Melkun filed an Other lawsuit against Kenneth A McLeod. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camille A. Melkun

Defendant

Kenneth A. Mcleod

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LATRONICA, ROBERT R.

Attorney at THE LATRONICA LAW FIRM, PC

Defendant Attorney

LAUBIS, CHRISTINE M

Attorney at Richard Lau & Assoc

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

No fee authorization order (Re-filing)

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

ORDER - DISCOVERY

FINAL DISCOVERY ORDER.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

Note of issue

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

ANSWER

Answer with Demands

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFF OF SVC MCLEOD

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No fee authorization order (Re-filing); Filed By: Latronica, R.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of issue; Filed By: Latronica, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCOVERY FINAL DISCOVERY ORDER.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Laubis, C.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Laubis, C.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer with Demands; Filed By: Laubis, C.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SVC MCLEOD; Filed By: Latronica, R.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Latronica, R.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less