This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:47:26 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC. - v. - JEFFREY WHITE et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JEFFREY WHITE. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE BO. OF ELECTIONS

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Ghans Maureen

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Jeffrey White

Marideth Simmons

JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein

ENK INTERNATIONAL LLC

74 EAST 95 CORP.

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 90 DAY

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 90 DAY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIDETH SIMMONS - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIDETH SIMMONS - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFREY WHITE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFREY WHITE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFF OF MERIT

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFF OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENK INTERNATIONAL LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENK INTERNATIONAL LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) DEPT OF DEFENSE SEARCH RESULTS

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) DEPT OF DEFENSE SEARCH RESULTS; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter withdrawing Order of Reference

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter withdrawing Order of Reference; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) AFFS OF MAILING 3215(g)

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) AFFS OF MAILING 3215(g); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFS OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT MARIDETH SIMMONS - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT MARIDETH SIMMONS - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND APPEARANCE LETTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND APPEARANCE LETTER; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT JEFFREY WHITE - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT JEFFREY WHITE - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter withdrawing Order of Reference; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND APPEARANCE LETTER; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) AFF OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) AFFS OF MAILING 3215(g); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) DEPT OF DEFENSE SEARCH RESULTS; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 90 DAY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) NOTICE OF DEFAULT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ENK INTERNATIONAL LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT MARIDETH SIMMONS - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIDETH SIMMONS - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JEFFREY WHITE - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFREY WHITE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less