This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:06:44 (UTC).

Byron A Taylor - v. - Demetris Jones et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Byron A Taylor filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Demetris Jones. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Byron A Taylor

Defendants

Richard Jones as Heirs and/or Distributors of Michael Jones, the deceased

Demetris Jones

Jane Does said names being fictitious, parties intended being possible tenants or occupants of premises, and corporations, other entities or persons who claim, or may claim, a lien against the premises or interest in the estate

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Taylor, Byron A

SOLOMON, BRIAN DAVID

Defendant Attorney

PAPPAS, ANDREW

Attorney at ANDREW PAPPAS, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) proposed order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) proposed order; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract of Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract of Sale; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Richard Jones affidavit

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Richard Jones affidavit; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

ORDER - OTHER dtd 12/19/17

ORDER - OTHER dtd 12/19/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Demetris Jones Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Demetris Jones Affidavit; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Architectural Survey and Fees Paid

EXHIBIT(S) - B Architectural Survey and Fees Paid; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of contract; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 12/19/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) proposed order; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Solomon, B.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Certificate of Appointmnt; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of contract; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Demetris Jones Affidavit; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Richard Jones affidavit; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Pappas, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Architectural Survey and Fees Paid; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract of Sale; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Taylor, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less