Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:53:02 (UTC).

Buffalo-Colonie, LLC - v. - The Board of Assessment Review for the Town of Colonie et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Buffalo-Colonie, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against The Board of Assessment Review for the Town of Colonie. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buffalo-Colonie, LLC

Defendants

The Assessor of the Town of Colonie

and the Town of Colonie, New York

The Board of Assessment Review for the Town of Colonie

Not Yet Classified

North Colonie Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER, SCOTT CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Kavinoky Cook LLP

Defendant Attorney

EDELMAN, ALLEGRA RUTH

Attorney at New York State Department of Financial Services, Health Bureau

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RYAN, WILLIAM FRANCIS

Attorney at TABNER RYAN & KENIRY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER consent order and judgment-entered by the clerk

ORDER - OTHER consent order and judgment-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Consent Order & Judgment

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Consent Order & Judgment; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Proof of Service on a Corporation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Proof of Service on a Corporation; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service By Mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service By Mail; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected*

RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected*; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION Petition

PETITION Petition; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER consent order and judgment-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Consent Order & Judgment; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Proof of Service on a Corporation; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service By Mail; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected*; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Petition; Filed By: Becker, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less