Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 03:28:28 (UTC).

BTRNC, INC., D/B/A BEECHTREE CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND NURSING - v. - SANDRA BAUER

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 BTRNC, INC , D/B/A BEECHTREE CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND NURSING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANDRA BAUER. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0086

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BTRNC, INC., D/B/A BEECHTREE CENTER FOR REHABILITATION AND NURSING

Defendant

Sandra Bauer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERVIS, HARVEY D.

Attorney at HINMAN HOWARD AND KATTELL

Defendant Attorney

BARTON, CHRISTOPHER ALLEN

Attorney at Barton Law Firm, LLP

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discover & Inspection

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discover & Inspection; Filed By: Barton, C.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Barton, C.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Account Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Account Statement; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Barton, C.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Discover & Inspection; Filed By: Barton, C.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Barton, C.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Account Statement; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Barton, C.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less