This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 03/17/2023 at 06:18:48 (UTC).

BSA SURVIVORS et al v. IRIQUOIS TRAIL CONCIL, BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/07/2021 BSA SURVIVORS filed an Other lawsuit against IRIQUOIS TRAIL CONCIL, BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Greene, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **9326

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BSA SURVIVORS

David Barton

Oscar Cotton

Steve Decker

Timothy Dutton

Eddie Knight

Gary Kotlarsz

Vincent Milton

John Proctor

Patrick Sullivan

David Cooper

Joshua Kepler

John Long

Defendant

IRIQUOIS TRAIL CONCIL, BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEINMAN, BERNARD V.

Defendant Attorney

BECKWITH, MATHEW WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kleinman, B.; Filed: 08/07/2021; Received: 08/07/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C

PROOF OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C; Filed By: Kleinman, B.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 10/19/2021; Received: 10/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order Approving Fifth Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order Approving Fifth Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 10/19/2021; Received: 10/19/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Order Approving Fifth Stipulation; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 10/19/2021; Received: 10/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beckwith, M.; Filed: 10/19/2021; Received: 10/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C; Filed By: Kleinman, B.; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kleinman, B.; Filed: 08/07/2021; Received: 08/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less