This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 15:18:38 (UTC).

Bryan Ortiz - v. - Jhon Giraldo et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 Bryan Ortiz filed an Other lawsuit against Jhon Giraldo. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Ortiz

Defendants

Quimet Rodriguez

Jhon Giraldo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVA, GEORGE

Attorney at BISOGNO & MEYERSON

Defendant Attorney

ALBEE, CHRISTOPHER J

Attorney at VOTTO & ALBEE, PLLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Albee, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rodriguez

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rodriguez; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Giraldo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Giraldo; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Albee, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRE-TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRE-TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rodriguez; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Giraldo; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kafer, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less