This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 02:00:42 (UTC).

Broome-Tioga BOCES et al v. Broome-Tioga BOCES Information Technology Professionals Association et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Broome-Tioga BOCES filed an Other lawsuit against Broome-Tioga BOCESInformation Technology Professionals Association. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Molly Fitzgerald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0802

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Molly Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allen D. Buyck

Broome-Tioga BOCES

Defendants

Broome-Tioga BOCES Information Technology Professionals Association

Edward Desantis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYNCH, JOHN PATRICK

Attorney at HOGAN, SARZYNSKI, LYNCH, DEWIND & GREGORY LLP

Defendant Attorney

BERGERON, MATTHEW EDWARD LOUIS

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE UNITED TEACHERS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

MEMORANDUM

MEMORANDUM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Bergeron, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Bergeron, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

PETITION Verified Petition for Stay

PETITION Verified Petition for Stay; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Bergeron, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Bergeron, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Stage 3 Grievance Denial; Filed By: Bergeron, M.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Petition; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Verified Petition for Stay; Filed By: Lynch, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less