This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:53:11 (UTC).

BROADRIVER TRF I, L.P., SERIES C - v. - KARL E. HOHNE et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 BROADRIVER TRF I, L P , SERIES C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KARL E HOHNE. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADRIVER TRF I, L.P., SERIES C

Defendants

Karl E. Hohne

County of Nassau

Discover Bank

Citibank South Dakota NA

The Williamsburgh Savings Bank

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Florence L. Hohne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL HUNTER

Attorney at BRONSTER LLP

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL H

Attorney at WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MANISCALCO, JOSEPH S

Attorney at LAMONICA HERBST & MANISCALCO LLP

FitzGerald, Melanie A.

Attorney at LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

 

Court Documents

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit B - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Affirmation in Support of Motion to Vacate Judgment and to Discontinue Action

NOTICE OF MOTION

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and to Discontinue Action

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)

--none--

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)

Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit to Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003); Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Support of Motion to Vacate Judgment and to Discontinue Action; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and to Discontinue Action; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by Advantage Legal; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less