Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:35:23 (UTC).

Brittany Diffullah - v. - Green Spa New York, Inc. d/b/a The Green Spa and Wellness Center et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 Brittany Diffullah filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Green Spa New York, Inc d/b/a The Green Spa and Wellness Center. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittany Diffullah

Defendants

Ilya Arnopolskiy

Green Spa New York, Inc. d/b/a The Green Spa and Wellness Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAN, IRENE

Attorney at Phillips & Associates

PHILLIPS, WILLIAM K

Attorney at Phillips & Associates

MESIDOR, MARJORIE

Attorney at PHILLIPS & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

STEVENS, BRITTANY ALEXANDRA

Attorney at Phillips & Associates, PLLC

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note dated 6/11/2019 nsp

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note dated 6/11/2019 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Irene Chan, Esq.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Irene Chan, Esq.; Filed By: Chan, I.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) DATED 3/13/19

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) DATED 3/13/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4); Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

ORDER - OTHER FDP order on Default of all Parties

ORDER - OTHER FDP order on Default of all Parties; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Short Form Order

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Short Form Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Interim Order

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Interim Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Compliance Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Summons and Amended Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Summons and Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stevens, B.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note dated 6/11/2019 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Irene Chan, Esq.; Filed By: Chan, I.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) DATED 3/13/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4); Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FDP order on Default of all Parties; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Short Form Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Interim Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Summons and Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Phillips, W. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Mesidor, M.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stevens, B.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less