Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 00:21:31 (UTC).

BRISA BUILDERS CORPORATION v. NORSTAR BUILDING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 BRISA BUILDERS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NORSTAR BUILDING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRISA BUILDERS CORPORATION

Defendant

NORSTAR BUILDING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUBELT, MATTHEW GRANT

Attorney at NEWMAN & LICKSTEIN, ATTORNEYS AND COUNSELORS AT LAW

Defendant Attorneys

GILLEN, PATRICIA

Attorney at DUKE, HOLZMAN, PHOTIADIS & GRESENS, LLP

LYONS, THOMAS DAVID

Attorney at Duke Holzman Photiadis & Gresens LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION Stipulation of Consolidation for Discovery Only

STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION Stipulation of Consolidation for Discovery Only; Filed By: Lyons, T.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaim

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaim; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Lyons, T.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lyons, T.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION Stipulation of Consolidation for Discovery Only; Filed By: Lyons, T.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaim; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Lyons, T.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lyons, T.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Betar, J.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less