This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:07:10 (UTC).

BRIGHTON HOUSE, INC. - v. - CASOL REALTY, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 BRIGHTON HOUSE, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CASOL REALTY, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIGHTON HOUSE, INC.

Defendant

CASOL REALTY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REILLY, MICHAEL THOMAS

Attorney at NORRIS MCLAUGHLIN P.A.

Defendant Attorneys

SLOWIK, CHRISTOPHER M.

Attorney at KLEIN SLOWIK PLLC

OVERLAND, JOHN L

Attorney at KLEIN SLOWIK, PLLC

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - C DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - C DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B SURVEY

EXHIBIT(S) - B SURVEY; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Copy of Affirmation in Support of Verified Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Copy of Affirmation in Support of Verified Petition; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - A DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L to Paudel affidavit -Casol

EXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L to Paudel affidavit -Casol; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) June 21, 2017 Order of Justice Toussaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) June 21, 2017 Order of Justice Toussaint; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D HPD BUILDING INFO

EXHIBIT(S) - D HPD BUILDING INFO; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Proposed Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Proposed Agreement; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E TAX MAP

EXHIBIT(S) - E TAX MAP; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - M Exhibit M to Paudel affidavit -Casol

EXHIBIT(S) - M Exhibit M to Paudel affidavit -Casol; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/6/17 nsp

ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/6/17 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G PICTURES

EXHIBIT(S) - G PICTURES; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - H CONDO DECLARATION

EXHIBIT(S) - H CONDO DECLARATION; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1) Amended Answer

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1) Amended Answer; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/29/17

ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/29/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F TEMPORARY C OF O

EXHIBIT(S) - F TEMPORARY C OF O; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 7/19/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 7/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR RPAPL 881 ORDER

PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR RPAPL 881 ORDER; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 11/29/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 9/6/17 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 7/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Proposed Agreement; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Copy of Affirmation in Support of Verified Petition; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) June 21, 2017 Order of Justice Toussaint; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1) Amended Answer; Filed By: Overland, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M Exhibit M to Paudel affidavit -Casol; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L to Paudel affidavit -Casol; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K Exhibit K to Paudel affidavit -Casol; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H CONDO DECLARATION; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G PICTURES; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F TEMPORARY C OF O; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E TAX MAP; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D HPD BUILDING INFO; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B SURVEY; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR RPAPL 881 ORDER; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less