This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:01:03 (UTC).

BRIGHTON HOUSE, INC. - v. - BOARD OF MANAGERS OF 3145 BRIGHTON FOURTH CONDOMINIUM et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 BRIGHTON HOUSE, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BOARD OF MANAGERS OF 3145 BRIGHTON FOURTH CONDOMINIUM. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIGHTON HOUSE, INC.

Defendants

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF 3145 BRIGHTON FOURTH CONDOMINIUM

3145 BRIGHTON FOURTH OWNERS

VKMJ INC

INNA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REILLY, MICHAEL THOMAS

Attorney at NORRIS MCLAUGHLIN P.A.

Defendant Attorney

ROWLAND, JAMES H

Attorney at ZETLIN & DE CHIARA

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/29/17

ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/29/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 7/19/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 7/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L to Paudel affidavit -3145

EXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - E DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - M Exhibit M to Paudel affidavit -3145

EXHIBIT(S) - M Exhibit M to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Lenny Zilper - Personal Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Lenny Zilper - Personal Service; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - K Exhibit K to Paudel affidavit -3145

EXHIBIT(S) - K Exhibit K to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - A DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F HPD BUILDING INFO

EXHIBIT(S) - F HPD BUILDING INFO; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C DECLARATION

EXHIBIT(S) - C DECLARATION; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - H DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - H DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR RPAPL 881 LICENSE

PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR RPAPL 881 LICENSE; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B SURVEY

EXHIBIT(S) - B SURVEY; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/6/17 nsp

ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/6/17 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G PICTURE

EXHIBIT(S) - G PICTURE; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail upon INNA, Inc. and VKMJ, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail upon INNA, Inc. and VKMJ, Inc.; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Jane Doe - Personal Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Jane Doe - Personal Service; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 11/29/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 9/6/17 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 7/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Jane Doe - Personal Service; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Lenny Zilper - Personal Service; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail upon INNA, Inc. and VKMJ, Inc.; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M Exhibit M to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K Exhibit K to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J Exhibit J to Paudel affidavit -3145; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I HPD BUILDING INFO; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G PICTURE; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F HPD BUILDING INFO; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C DECLARATION; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B SURVEY; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A DEED; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR RPAPL 881 LICENSE; Filed By: Reilly, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less