This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:12:49 (UTC).

BRICK KV CAPITAL LLC - v. - RORA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 BRICK KV CAPITAL LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RORA LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Francis A Kahn Iii. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Francis A Kahn Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRICK KV CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

JANE DOE and JOHN DOE 1 to 10

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE HAMPTON HOUSE CONDOMINIUM

RORA LLC

Robert Litwin

Not Yet Classified

Elaine Shay, as Referee

404 EAST 79TH STREET LENDER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

SNIDER, ALAN

Attorney at ALAN SNIDER, ATTY AT LAW

ANDRIOLA, JAMES M

Attorney at Andriola Law, PLLC

SHAY, ELAINE

Attorney at ELAINE SHAY, ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LASKOWITZ, SHARI

Attorney at INGRAM, YUZEK, GAINEN, CARROLL & BERTOLOTTI, LLP

MORRISON, LAWRENCE F.

Attorney at Morrison Tenenbaum PLLC

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

NOTICE

--none--

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Shay, E.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) Suggestion of Bankruptcy

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) Suggestion of Bankruptcy; Filed By: Morrison, L.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service of Order to Show Cause

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #003) Ex 7 to Kassin Aff (Redline Comparison of Proposed Amended Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale)

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #003) Ex 7 to Kassin Aff (Redline Comparison of Proposed Amended Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003) Ex 6 to Kassin Aff (Proposed Amended Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale)

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003) Ex 6 to Kassin Aff (Proposed Amended Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003) Ex 5 to Kassin Aff (Consent to Change Attorney)

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003) Ex 5 to Kassin Aff (Consent to Change Attorney); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Morrison, L.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F NOTICE OF ACCELERATION

EXHIBIT(S) - F NOTICE OF ACCELERATION; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - E MODIFICATION AGREEMENT; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D RESTATED NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - D RESTATED NOTE; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C GUARANTY

EXHIBIT(S) - C GUARANTY; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Shay, E.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) Suggestion of Bankruptcy; Filed By: Morrison, L.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #003) Ex 7 to Kassin Aff (Redline Comparison of Proposed Amended Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003) Ex 6 to Kassin Aff (Proposed Amended Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003) Ex 5 to Kassin Aff (Consent to Change Attorney); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Ex 4 to Kassin Aff (Assignment of Judgment); Filed By: Andriola, J.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morrison, L.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Morrison, L.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F NOTICE OF ACCELERATION; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E MODIFICATION AGREEMENT; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D RESTATED NOTE; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C GUARANTY; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Snider, A.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less