This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:44:15 (UTC).

BRIAN MARTINEAU - v. - FRANCIS J. FERRIZZ et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 BRIAN MARTINEAU filed an Other lawsuit against FRANCIS J FERRIZZ. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Martineau

Defendants

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL INC.

Francis J. Ferrizz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, BRIAN J.

Attorney at Brian J. Levy & Associates PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

PFUHLER, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at CONNORS & CONNORS, P.C.

MARTIN, STEVEN

Attorney at LEAHEY & JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Martin, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levy, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Pfuhler, R.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice & Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice & Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Martin, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Martin, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice & Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Martin, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Pfuhler, R.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Levy, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levy, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less