Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 11:49:39 (UTC).

BRIAN CROSBY - v. - AJA TURNPIKE PROPERTIES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 BRIAN CROSBY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AJA TURNPIKE PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret Chan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret Chan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Crosby

Defendants and Petitioners

CINOS EAST MEADOW, LLC

CONBOY & MANNION CONTRACTING, INC.

SONIC INDUSTRIES SERVICES INC.

AJA TURNPIKE PROPERTIES LLC

SONIC INDUSTRIES LLC

Respondent

JMJ RESIDENTIAL CONSTRUCTION, INC. d/b/a JMJ BUILDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELNER, GAIL S

Attorney at KELNER & KELNER

Gambeski, George P

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. GAMBESKI

Petitioner Attorneys

EUGENE P. GRIMES (N-08698) WON J. SOHNG ROBERT ADAM FISHKIN

EUGENE P. GRIMES (N-08698) ROBERT ADAM FISHKIN

Defendant Attorneys

FISHKIN, ROBERT ADAM

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. GAMBESKI

AMBROSE, WILLIAM

Attorney at Gambeski & Frum

GRIMES, EUGENE P.

Attorney at GAMBESKI & FRUM

SOHNG, WON J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. GAMBESKI

RUSSO, ALAN S

Attorney at RUSSO & TONER LLP

CASTRONUOVO, MARIE ADELE

Attorney at RUSSO & TONER, LLP

KOSTER, WARREN STEPHEN

Attorney at Koster, Brady & Nagler, LLP

Respondent Attorney

VICTOR MEVORAH

 

Court Documents

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE *Corrected*

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/24/2020; Received: 06/24/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Notice of Entry of October 23, 2019 Decision and Order on Mtn # 002

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

ANSWER

Answer for AJA Turnpike Properties LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CONBOY & MANNION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CINOS EAST MEADOW

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SONIC INDUSTRIES SERVICES INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SONIC INDUSTRIES LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - AJA TURNPIKE

CONSENT TO EFILING

E-FILING COMMENCEMENT FORM

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/24/2020; Received: 06/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Stewart, W.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Stewart, W.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Stewart, W.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Notice of Entry of October 23, 2019 Decision and Order on Mtn # 002; Filed By: Waytowich, J.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Sonic Industries LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc's Verified Answer to the Verified Complaint; Filed By: Russo, A.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Ambrose, W.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer for AJA Turnpike Properties LLC; Filed By: Koster, W.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CONBOY & MANNION; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CINOS EAST MEADOW; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SONIC INDUSTRIES SERVICES INC.; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SONIC INDUSTRIES LLC; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - AJA TURNPIKE; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING E-FILING COMMENCEMENT FORM; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kelner, G.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less