This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 10/25/2020 at 08:55:20 (UTC).

BRENDYN OMOTAYO OWOYEMI v. FORDHAM UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 BRENDYN OMOTAYO OWOYEMI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORDHAM UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Wavny Toussaint. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Wavny Toussaint

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brendyn Omotayo Owoyemi

Defendants

FORDHAM UNIVERSITY

ALLIED ACCOUNT SERVICES INC.

HEARTLAND ECSI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owoyemi, Brendyn O

Defendant Attorney

CORRELL, DANIEL EDWARD

Attorney at Fordham University

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Defendant's Reply Brief

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Defendant's Reply Brief; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Daniel E. Correll in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Daniel E. Correll in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Owoyemi, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Defendant's Reply Brief; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Daniel E. Correll in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Filed By: Correll, D.; Filed: 10/23/2020; Received: 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Owoyemi, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less