Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 21:12:17 (UTC).

Bradley Rupp v. 23 South Buffalo Street, Inc., d/b/a Pour House et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Bradley Rupp filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 23 South Buffalo Street, Inc , d/b/a Pour House. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Montour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mark A Montour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradley Rupp

Defendants

23 South Buffalo Street, Inc., d/b/a Pour House

Alexander Way Holding Corp.

John Doe 1 (said name being ficitious but intended to be an employee, contractor, or agent of Defendant, 23 South Buffalo Street, d/b/a Pour House

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIORKOWSKI, JACOB ANDREW

Attorney at The Tarantino Law Firm, LLP

Defendant Attorney

MCCANN, RYAN FRANCIS

Attorney at ATTEA & ATTEA, P.C

 

Court Documents

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Mccann, R.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Replacement of affidavit of service for 23 South Buffalo Inc, d/b/a Pour House - previous affidavit (..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Replacement of affidavit of service for 23 South Buffalo Inc, d/b/a Pour House - previous affidavit (..); Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on John Doe - substituted service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on John Doe - substituted service; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alexander Way Holding Co. - substituted service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alexander Way Holding Co. - substituted service; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 23 South Buffalo, Inc. - substituted service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 23 South Buffalo, Inc. - substituted service; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alexander Way Holding Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alexander Way Holding Corp.; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on 23 South Buffalo Street, d/b/a Pour House

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on 23 South Buffalo Street, d/b/a Pour House; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Mccann, R.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Email; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Mccann, R.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Mccann, R.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Replacement of affidavit of service for 23 South Buffalo Inc, d/b/a Pour House - previous affidavit filed for this defendant filed in error; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on John Doe - substituted service; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alexander Way Holding Co. - substituted service; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 23 South Buffalo, Inc. - substituted service; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alexander Way Holding Corp.; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on 23 South Buffalo Street, d/b/a Pour House; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Piorkowski, J.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less