This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:02:48 (UTC).

BORO PARK BP LP et al - v. - 5002 HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 BORO PARK BP LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 5002 HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter Paul Sweeney, Pt73. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Peter Paul Sweeney, Pt73

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BPBP GP LLC

BORO PARK BP LP

Defendant

5002 HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPEYER, JAY R

Attorney at MORRISON COHEN LLP

JARASHOW, MARK SAMUEL

Attorney at Morrison Cohen LLP

MCLAUGHLIN, TERENCE KEVIN

Attorney at MORRISON COHEN LLP

MILITO, CHRISTOPHER S

Attorney at Morrison Cohen LLP

SCHARF, YEHUDA D

Attorney at MORRISON COHEN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SELBST, STEPHEN B.

Attorney at HERRICK FEINSTEIN, LLP

MEHLMAN, AVERY S

Attorney at HERRICK, FEINSTEIN LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Speyer, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

ORDER - OTHER withdrawn

ORDER - OTHER withdrawn; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING *Corrected* OSC WITHDRAWN BY MOVANT.

DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING *Corrected* OSC WITHDRAWN BY MOVANT.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary ... show more

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary ... show more; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 13 Exhibit 13 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 13 Exhibit 13 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 12 Exhibit 12 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 12 Exhibit 12 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 11 Exhibit 11 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 11 Exhibit 11 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Exhibit 10 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Exhibit 10 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Schwebel Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Emergency Affidavit of Aryeh Schwebel in Support of Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunction

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Emergency Affidavit of Aryeh Schwebel in Support of Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunction; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to McLaughlin Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to McLaughlin Affirmation; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to McLaughlin Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to McLaughlin Affirmation; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation of Terence K. McLaughlin in Support of Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunction

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation of Terence K. McLaughlin in Support of Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunction; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Speyer, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER withdrawn; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING *Corrected* OSC WITHDRAWN BY MOVANT.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 13 Exhibit 13 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 12 Exhibit 12 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 11 Exhibit 11 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 10 Exhibit 10 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 Exhibit 9 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Schwebel Affidavit; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Emergency Affidavit of Aryeh Schwebel in Support of Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunction; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to McLaughlin Affirmation; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to McLaughlin Affirmation; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation of Terence K. McLaughlin in Support of Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunction; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mclaughlin, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less