This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:19:57 (UTC).

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE HILLS AT GRASMERE CONDOMINIUM II - v. - JANIE DELUCA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE HILLS AT GRASMERE CONDOMINIUM II filed an Other lawsuit against JANIE DELUCA. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE HILLS AT GRASMERE CONDOMINIUM II

Defendant

Janie Deluca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE MIZIO, STEVEN DANIEL

Attorney at CONTI LAW FIRM, PLLC

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A for Notice of Pendency 51 Claradon Lane

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A for Notice of Pendency 51 Claradon Lane; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Schedule A attached as Exhibit

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Schedule A attached as Exhibit; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Request for Judicial Intervention- not available to select from Document Type

RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Request for Judicial Intervention- not available to select from Document Type; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Proof of service of Order to Show Cause and supporting docs

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Proof of service of Order to Show Cause and supporting docs; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) legal fee attorney affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) legal fee attorney affirmation; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) deluca client affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) deluca client affidavit; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Condo Declaration

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Condo Declaration; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) letter warning of declaration violation

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) letter warning of declaration violation; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed to property

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed to property; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Previously submitted in hard copy and already signed by judge

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Previously submitted in hard copy and already signed by judge; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A for Notice of Pendency 51 Claradon Lane; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Schedule A attached as Exhibit; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Request for Judicial Intervention- not available to select from Document Type; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Proof of service of Order to Show Cause and supporting docs; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) legal fee attorney affirmation; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) deluca client affidavit; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Condo Declaration; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) letter warning of declaration violation; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed to property; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Previously submitted in hard copy and already signed by judge; Filed By: De Mizio, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less