Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 22:39:33 (UTC).

Board of Managers of the 300 West 53 Condominium v. Westside RE 300 Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 Board of Managers of the 300 West 53 Condominium filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Westside RE 300 Corp. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Managers of the 300 West 53 Condominium

Defendants

Richard Shulman

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

New York City Department of Finance

Jane Doe

Westside RE 300 Corp.

New York City Environmental Control Board

Sparky Capital, LLC

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARBONNEAU, MICHELLE C

Attorney at FINDER NOVICK KERRIGAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

MIRRO, MICHELE

Attorney at NYC Department of Finance

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #001) Non-Mortgage/Condo Foreclosure

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #001) Non-Mortgage/Condo Foreclosure; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Ex I - Common Charges Ledger

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Ex I - Common Charges Ledger; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Ex H - Bylaws

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Ex H - Bylaws; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Ex G - Declaration

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Ex G - Declaration; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Ex F - NYC DOF Notice of Appearance & Waiver

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Ex F - NYC DOF Notice of Appearance & Waiver; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Ex E - Affs of Service & Due Diligence

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Ex E - Affs of Service & Due Diligence; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Ex D - Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Ex D - Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C - Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C - Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - NYS DOF

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - NYS DOF; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Sparky Capital

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Sparky Capital; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Westside

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Westside; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex D - Account Ledger

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex D - Account Ledger; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex C - Notice of Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex C - Notice of Lien; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B - Property Info

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B - Property Info; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A - Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A - Deed; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #001) Non-Mortgage/Condo Foreclosure; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Ex I - Common Charges Ledger; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Ex H - Bylaws; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Ex G - Declaration; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Ex F - NYC DOF Notice of Appearance & Waiver; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Ex E - Affs of Service & Due Diligence; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Ex D - Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C - Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Ex B - Notice of Lien; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - NYC ECB; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - NYS DOF; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Sparky Capital; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Westside; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Ex D - Account Ledger; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Ex C - Notice of Lien; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B - Property Info; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A - Deed; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Charbonneau, M.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less