Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 20:41:28 (UTC).

Board of Managers of 444 East 57th Street Condominium v. Springs Fireplace Properties, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Board of Managers of 444 East 57th Street Condominium filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Springs Fireplace Properties, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Managers of 444 East 57th Street Condominium

Defendants

Jane Doe

New York City Department of Finance

John Doe

Ella Strangmark

Springs Fireplace Properties, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUCK, RYAN PETER

Attorney at SMITH, BUSS & JACOBS, LLP

Defendant Attorney

MIRRO, MICHELE

Attorney at NYC Department of Finance

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Mirro, M.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Schedule A

EXHIBIT(S) - F Schedule A; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Notice of Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - E Notice of Lien; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D By-Laws

EXHIBIT(S) - D By-Laws; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Declaration

EXHIBIT(S) - C Declaration; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - B Deed; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A (property description)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A (property description); Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Mirro, M.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Schedule A; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Notice of Lien; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D By-Laws; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Declaration; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Deed; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A (property description); Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Houck, R. - filed by Smith, Buss & Jacobs, LLP; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less