This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 20:59:15 (UTC).

Blanca Schneider v. Isaac Babaev et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Blanca Schneider filed an Other lawsuit against Isaac Babaev. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard D Steinman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Leonard D Steinman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blanca Schneider

Defendants

Friendly Limousine Service Inc.

Isaac Babaev

Northbay Builders Corp

Khalid Igbal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARINO, GIULIA RAMONA

Attorney at Marino & Marino, P.C.

MARINO, SALVATORE RAYMOND

Attorney at MARINO & MARINO, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

PIETRO, JARET SAN

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Pietro, J.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of settlement

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of settlement; Filed By: Marino, S.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS

ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Pietro, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Pietro, J.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of settlement; Filed By: Marino, S.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Pietro, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marino, G.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less