Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/20/2021 at 06:59:19 (UTC).

Blake-Riv Realty LLC v. Mohammed Quasem

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Blake-Riv Realty LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mohammed Quasem. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David B Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David B Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blake-Riv Realty LLC

Defendant

Mohammed Quasem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLFERT, JONATHAN PAUL

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

WOLFE, OWEN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of March 10, 2021 Order

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of March 10, 2021 Order; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 03/12/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re: Court Order, Summons and Complaint, and OTSC Papers

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re: Court Order, Summons and Complaint, and OTSC Papers; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/25/2021; Received: 02/25/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SO ORDERED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Mahabir Affidavit Exhibit B -- Photos of Unsafe and Unsanitary Conditions

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Mahabir Affidavit Exhibit B -- Photos of Unsafe and Unsanitary Conditions; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Mahabir Affidavit Exhibit A -- Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Mahabir Affidavit Exhibit A -- Lease; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affidavit of Samuel Mahabir

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affidavit of Samuel Mahabir; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affidavit of Charles Adejobi

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affidavit of Charles Adejobi; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Wolfe Affirmation Exhibit A -- Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Wolfe Affirmation Exhibit A -- Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Owen R. Wolfe

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Owen R. Wolfe; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Emergency

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Emergency; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of March 10, 2021 Order; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 03/12/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2021; Received: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re: Court Order, Summons and Complaint, and OTSC Papers; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/25/2021; Received: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Mahabir Affidavit Exhibit B -- Photos of Unsafe and Unsanitary Conditions; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Mahabir Affidavit Exhibit A -- Lease; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affidavit of Samuel Mahabir; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affidavit of Charles Adejobi; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Wolfe Affirmation Exhibit A -- Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Owen R. Wolfe; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Emergency; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/19/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wolfe, O.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less