This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:47:47 (UTC).

BIENVENIDO SERRANO JR v. ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 BIENVENIDO SERRANO JR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST BARNABAS HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph E Capella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph E Capella

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bienvenido Serrano JR As the Administrator of The Estate of FRANCISCA MIRANDA, Deceased,

Defendants

Katrina V. Victoria M.D.

BRONX GARDENS REHABILITATION AND NURSING CENTER

ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIUFFRA, THOMAS PETER

Attorney at Rheingold Giuffra Ruffo & Plotkin LLP

RUFFO, EDWARD ANTHONY

Attorney at RHEINGOLD GIUFFRA RUFFO & PLOTKIN, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

KUTNER, CHARLES E

Attorney at KUTNER FRIEDRICH, LLP

MICKIEWICZ, JULIE A

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

GANZENMULLER, RYAN G.

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

KHAN, SABINA

Attorney at Garbarini & Scher, P.C.

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM

MEMORANDUM; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

DEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce

DEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 09/30/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 09/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

DEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT KATRINA VICTORIA, M.D.

DEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT KATRINA VICTORIA, M.D.; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Khan, S.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Khan, S.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition Upon Oral Examination - Bronx Garden

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition Upon Oral Examination - Bronx Garden; Filed By: Mickiewicz, J.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer - Bronx Gardens

ANSWER Verified Answer - Bronx Gardens; Filed By: Mickiewicz, J.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Giuffra, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Giuffra, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Giuffra, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Khan, S.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce; Filed By: Kutner, C.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 09/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT KATRINA VICTORIA, M.D.; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT KATRINA VICTORIA, M.D. COMBINED DEMANDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Mickiewicz, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Khan, S.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Khan, S.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition Upon Oral Examination - Bronx Garden; Filed By: Mickiewicz, J.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer - Bronx Gardens; Filed By: Mickiewicz, J.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Giuffra, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Giuffra, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Giuffra, T. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Khan, S.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruffo, E.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less