Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 02:46:38 (UTC).

BETH KAPLAN Administratrix of the Estate of et al v. SHIPHALI ROHATGI MD et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 BETH KAPLAN Administratrix of the Estate of filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SHIPHALI ROHATGI MD. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beth Kaplan ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF Mark Kaplan deceased

Beth Kaplan Individually

Defendants

Louis Swartz MD

Shiphali Rohatgi MD

Farid Shahkoohi MD

Scott M Schonfeld DPM

Charles A Mitgang MD

John Doe-a

John Doe-d

PARK AVENUE EXTENDED CARE FACILITY

CHARLES A MITGANG MD PC

Charles Sticco DO

John Doe-b

John Doe-c

SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL

Robert Clarke MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHASE, MARC JEREMY

Attorney at Goldberg & Chase

Defendant Attorneys

BORANIAN, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at MONTFORT, HEALY, MCGUIRE & SALLEY LLP

BENVENUTO, THOMAS J

Attorney at Law Offices of Benvenuto & Slattery

ZEPPIERI, LORIS

Attorney at KELLY RODE KELLY

GELARDI, MARILI

Attorney at kelly rode & kelly,llp

PEWARSKI, GLEN THOMAS

Attorney at BARTLETT LLP

DYCKMAN, DEBORAH A

Attorney at BARTLETT LLP

PANARO, ALYSSA MICHELLE

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

MCNAMEE, GLENN PAUL

Attorney at Connick, Myers, McNamee & Fitzgerald, P.L.L.C.

VARRIALE, PAUL RICHARD

Attorney at LEWIS JOHS AVALLONE AVILES, LLP

VALVO, LOUIS E.

Attorney at KOSTER, BRADY & NAGLER, LLP

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Exchange of Medical Authorizations

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Exchange of Medical Authorizations; Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Robert H. Clark, M.D.

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Robert H. Clark, M.D.; Filed By: Valvo, L.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING Consent to E-Filing - Robert H. Clarke, M.D.

CONSENT TO EFILING Consent to E-Filing - Robert H. Clarke, M.D.; Filed By: Valvo, L.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Louis Swartz, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Louis Swartz, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Charles Sticco, D.O. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Charles Sticco, D.O. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS South Nassau Communities Hospital Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS South Nassau Communities Hospital Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Farid Shahkoohi, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Farid Shahkoohi, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Scott M. Schonfeld, DPM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Scott M. Schonfeld, DPM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Shiphali Rohatgi, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Shiphali Rohatgi, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

ANSWER as to Charles A Mitgang MD PC

ANSWER as to Charles A Mitgang MD PC; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

ANSWER Answer and Discovery Demands

ANSWER Answer and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Mcnamee, G.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Exchange of Medical Authorizations; Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Robert H. Clark, M.D.; Filed By: Valvo, L.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Consent to E-Filing - Robert H. Clarke, M.D.; Filed By: Valvo, L.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Louis Swartz, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Charles Sticco, D.O. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS South Nassau Communities Hospital Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Farid Shahkoohi, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Scott M. Schonfeld, DPM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Shiphali Rohatgi, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER as to Farid Shahkoohi MD; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER as to Charles A Mitgang MD PC; Filed By: Zeppieri, L. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Panaro, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Mcnamee, G.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chase, M.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less