Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 14:08:41 (UTC).

Berkshire Bank v. Mary R. Stevenson

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Berkshire Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mary R Stevenson. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berkshire Bank

Defendant

Mary R. Stevenson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, LOUIS

Attorney at MELVIN & MELVIN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 05, 2020

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 05, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #001)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) military search

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) military search; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) non military

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) non military; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) 3215; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) AOS; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SC

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 05, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) military search; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) non military; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) 3215; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) AOS; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less