This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:27:11 (UTC).

BERGEN 1935 HOLDINGS LLC, - v. - MARIO A/K/A MARIA CAMPO et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2017 BERGEN 1935 HOLDINGS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIO A/K/A MARIA CAMPO. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERGEN 1935 HOLDINGS LLC,

Defendants

MARIO A/K/A MARIA CAMPO

Anthony Ortiz

Nathan Cloud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAVULICH, GARY M

Attorney at KAVULICH & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER extending time to serve, dtd 4/15/18

ORDER - OTHER extending time to serve, dtd 4/15/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Tenant ledger

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Tenant ledger; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Lease Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Lease Agreement; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Deed; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support w Backer

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support w Backer; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit in Support with Breakdown of arrears and copy of the lease attached.

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit in Support with Breakdown of arrears and copy of the lease attached.; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Investigator for Anthony Ortiz

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Investigator for Anthony Ortiz; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Investigator for Mario a/k/a Maria Campo

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Investigator for Mario a/k/a Maria Campo; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

BILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs

BILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment Proposed

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment Proposed; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Anthony Ortiz

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Anthony Ortiz; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Mario a/k/a Maria Campo

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Mario a/k/a Maria Campo; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER extending time to serve, dtd 4/15/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Tenant ledger; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Lease Agreement; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Deed; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support w Backer; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry for Judgment entered.; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit in Support with Breakdown of arrears and copy of the lease attached.; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Investigator for Anthony Ortiz; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Investigator for Mario a/k/a Maria Campo; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment Proposed; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Anthony Ortiz; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Mario a/k/a Maria Campo; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kavulich, G.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less