This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 18:57:51 (UTC).

BENTZEN FINANCIAL LLC - v. - AMERICAN GENERAL ANNUITY SERVICE CORP et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 BENTZEN FINANCIAL LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN GENERAL ANNUITY SERVICE CORP. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENTZEN FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

UNITED STATES LIFE INS COMP

AMERICAN GENERAL ANNUITY SERVICE CORP

Michael Mensah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDIMARTE, LUIGI

Attorney at SACCO & FILLAS, LLP ATTORNEYS AT LAW

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Copy of Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Copy of Order; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/06/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) SSPA

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) SSPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) IPA

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) IPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G Payee's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - G Payee's Affidavit; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - F Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E Transfer Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - E Transfer Agreement; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Structured Settlement Annuity Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - D Structured Settlement Annuity Contract; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Uniform Qualified Assignment, Release and Pledge Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Uniform Qualified Assignment, Release and Pledge Agreement; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Settlement Agreement and Release

EXHIBIT(S) - B Settlement Agreement and Release; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payee's Statement of Dependents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payee's Statement of Dependents; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) *Corrected*

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

PETITION *Corrected*

PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Copy of Order; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) SSPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) IPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Payee's Affidavit; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - h IPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Payee's Affidavit; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Transfer Agreement; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Structured Settlement Annuity Contract; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Uniform Qualified Assignment, Release and Pledge Agreement; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Settlement Agreement and Release; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Payee's Statement of Dependents; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less