This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:50:37 (UTC).

Benjamin Reches - v. - SACK & SACK, LLP

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Benjamin Reches filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SACK SACK, LLP. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Reches

Defendant

SACK & SACK, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reches, Ben

Defendant Attorneys

RYAN, CATHERINE MARIAN

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

ANESH, MARK KENNETH

Attorney at LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Term Sheet

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Term Sheet; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dtd 6/28/18

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dtd 6/28/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Settlement Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Settlement Agreement; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Complaint; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal + RADI + Order + Affidavit

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal + RADI + Order + Affidavit; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Anesh, M.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal + RADI + Order + Affidavit

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal + RADI + Order + Affidavit; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

NOTICE REFUND GIVEN FOR MOTION FEE; INTENDED TO FILE AN APPEAL (DOCUMENT 52)

NOTICE REFUND GIVEN FOR MOTION FEE; INTENDED TO FILE AN APPEAL (DOCUMENT 52); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE REFUND GIVEN FOR MOTION FEE; INTENDED TO FILE AN APPEAL (DOCUMENT 52); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal + RADI + Order + Affidavit; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal + RADI + Order + Affidavit; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dtd 6/28/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Mediation Statement; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Settlement Agreement; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Term Sheet; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Complaint; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Ryan, C.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Anesh, M.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Reches, B. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less