This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:39:26 (UTC).

Benjamin M Adams - v. - Brenda Austin et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Benjamin M Adams filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Brenda Austin. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin M Adams

Defendants

Focal Insurance Insulting

Brenda Austin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, BENJAMIN M

Attorney at ADAMS LAW GROUP LLC

Defendant Attorney

SARACINO, GREGORY R

Attorney at SARACINO MORRIS LAW GROUP PLLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) Motion#1 granted without opposition

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) Motion#1 granted without opposition; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Adams, B.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Adams, B.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice of Appearance and Demand for a Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice of Appearance and Demand for a Complaint; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons with Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons with Notice; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance & Demand for a Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance & Demand for a Complaint; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE **Corrected** Prior Filing Designated Westchester

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE **Corrected** Prior Filing Designated Westchester; Filed By: Adams, B.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) Motion#1 granted without opposition; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Adams, B.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Adams, B.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice of Appearance and Demand for a Complaint; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons with Notice; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance & Demand for a Complaint; Filed By: Saracino, G.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE **Corrected** Prior Filing Designated Westchester; Filed By: Adams, B.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less