This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:15:12 (UTC).

BEATRIZ ISABEL v. KASHMIRI MANAGEMENT LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 BEATRIZ ISABEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KASHMIRI MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine M Didomenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine M Didomenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beatriz Isabel

Defendants

KASHMIRI MANAGEMENT LLC

Mohammad Y Dar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GROSSMAN, JACK

Attorney at MALLILO & GROSSMAN, ESQ

pomara, francesco

Attorney at MALLILO & GROSSMAN

Defendant Attorney

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS

ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Grossman, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Grossman, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less