This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:42:18 (UTC).

Beatriz Acevedo - v. - The Bread Depot, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Beatriz Acevedo filed an Other lawsuit against The Bread Depot, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beatriz Acevedo

Defendants

Gerard Alongi

The Bread Depot, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, TIMOTHY MICHAEL

Attorney at The Sullivan Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

KRISHNARAJ, HARIHARAN

Attorney at Bilello & Associates

CABRERA, JACQUELINE

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

MCCALL, BRIAN JUDE

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Krishnaraj, H.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/8/17 nsp.

ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/8/17 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Krishnaraj, H.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #2) NOI, S&C, Answer, BP, PCO, CCO, Final Pre-Note Order Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #2) NOI, S&C, Answer, BP, PCO, CCO, Final Pre-Note Order Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Krishnaraj, H.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 6/20/18

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 6/20/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-G (Motion #2) NOI, S&C, Answer, BP, PCO, CCO, Final Pre-Note Order Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Mccall, B.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 6/20/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 9/8/17 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Krishnaraj, H.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Krishnaraj, H.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Krishnaraj, H.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sullivan, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less