This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 05/10/2023 at 06:41:45 (UTC).

Beatrice Weber et al v. New York State Education Department et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Beatrice Weber filed an Other lawsuit against New York State Education Department. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Albany County Supreme Court located in Madison, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Adam W Silverman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3-21

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Adam W Silverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beatrice Weber

David J. Shapiro

Defendants

New York State Education Department

Betty A. Rosa

New York City Department of Education

Meisha Porter

Yeshiva Mesivta Arugath Habosem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, DAVID JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

Pederson, Helena Obi

KERWIN, ADRIENNE JENNIFER

WHITE, DAVID CHARLES

FRANK, PHILIP S.

SCHICK, AVI D

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Adam W. Silverman

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Adam W. Silverman; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2022; Received: 11/14/2022

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Proposed OSC

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Proposed OSC; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 DOE YMAH Recommendation

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 DOE YMAH Recommendation; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 SED YMAH Determination

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 SED YMAH Determination; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Shapiro Affm. in Support of Proposed OSC

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Shapiro Affm. in Support of Proposed OSC; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter advising Court of compliance with Order

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter advising Court of compliance with Order; Filed By: Kerwin, A.; Filed: 10/11/2022; Received: 10/11/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Corrected Letter From D. Shapiro to Justice Silverman

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Corrected Letter From D. Shapiro to Justice Silverman; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 10/08/2022; Received: 10/08/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Court re SED Violation of Court Order

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Court re SED Violation of Court Order; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 10/08/2022; Received: 10/08/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Weber Supp. Affd.

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Weber Supp. Affd.; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Weber Reply Affd.

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Weber Reply Affd.; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Weber Affd.

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Weber Affd.; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of David J. Shapiro in Support of Verified Petition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of David J. Shapiro in Support of Verified Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

NOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

PETITION Verified Petition

PETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Adam W. Silverman; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2022; Received: 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Proposed OSC; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 DOE YMAH Recommendation; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 SED YMAH Determination; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Shapiro Affm. in Support of Proposed OSC; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter advising Court of compliance with Order; Filed By: Kerwin, A.; Filed: 10/11/2022; Received: 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Corrected Letter From D. Shapiro to Justice Silverman; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 10/08/2022; Received: 10/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Court re SED Violation of Court Order; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 10/08/2022; Received: 10/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order Discovery Motion; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 Complaint Letter; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 Weber Supp. Affd.; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 Weber Reply Affd.; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Weber Affd.; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of David J. Shapiro in Support of Verified Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less