Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 03/19/2021 at 06:50:54 (UTC).

BCMB1 TRUST v. JERRY EINHORN et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 BCMB1 TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JERRY EINHORN. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCMB1 TRUST

Defendants

ENDICOTT PROPERTIES, LLC

Jerry Einhorn

JOHN DOE NO. 1 THROUGH JOHN DOE NO. 99, SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, PARTIES INTENDED BEING POSSIBLE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION & FINANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHLAND, DANIEL H.

Attorney at Richland & Falkowski, PLLC

FALKOWSKI, MICHAL

Attorney at Richland & Falkowski, PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - RJI; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Attempted Service - John Does

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Attempted Service - John Does; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Einhorn

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Einhorn; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Endicott Properties

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Endicott Properties; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/04/2021; Received: 03/04/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - NYS DoT&F

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - NYS DoT&F; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/03/2021; Received: 03/03/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Endicott Properties

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Endicott Properties; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/03/2021; Received: 03/03/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - RJI; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Attempted Service - John Does; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Einhorn; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Endicott Properties; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/04/2021; Received: 03/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - NYS DoT&F; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/03/2021; Received: 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Endicott Properties; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 03/03/2021; Received: 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less