This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:26:28 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC - v. - TERRY WILLIAMSON et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TERRY WILLIAMSON. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

John Doe

EAB MORTGAGE COMPANY, INC.

Terry Williamson

THE UNION SAVINGS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

Defendant Attorney

DAPELO, ROBERT WALTER

Attorney at Robert W. Dapelo PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215-TERRY WILLIAMSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215-TERRY WILLIAMSON; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by JQM - 20171518

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by JQM - 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

NOTICE OF REJECTION Notice of Withdrawal of Rejection of Answer

NOTICE OF REJECTION Notice of Withdrawal of Rejection of Answer; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) FILED BY CNW 20171518

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) FILED BY CNW 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/17/2018; Received: 07/17/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Filed by MXT 20171518

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Filed by MXT 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter for Notice of Withdrawal of Rejection of Answer

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter for Notice of Withdrawal of Rejection of Answer; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed by EJB 20171518

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed by EJB 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE (Motion #001) signed da order

ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE (Motion #001) signed da order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE (Motion #001) signed da order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Filed by MXT 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) FILED BY CNW 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/17/2018; Received: 07/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by JQM - 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed by EJB 20171518; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION Notice of Withdrawal of Rejection of Answer; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter for Notice of Withdrawal of Rejection of Answer; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Service Affidavit; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-TERRY WILLIAMSON; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215-TERRY WILLIAMSON; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less