This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 17:16:43 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC v. JOHN L. STRAVATO II et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHN L STRAVATO II. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1221

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

JOHN DOE #1- #50 AND MARY ROE #1- #50, THE LAST TWO NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, IT B

John L Stravato II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRARY, BRENT ALAN

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

JOHNSON, HEATHER ANN

Attorney at Mandarich Law Group, LLP

MCGINN, MATTHEW BRIAN

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO OTHER OCCUPANTS AT THE PROPERTY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO OTHER OCCUPANTS AT THE PROPERTY; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRACY STORER SHA MARY ROE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRACY STORER SHA MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN L STRAVATO II

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN L STRAVATO II; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRACY STORER SHA MARY ROE #1 1303 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRACY STORER SHA MARY ROE #1 1303 MAILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN L. STRAVATO II 3215 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN L. STRAVATO II 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Second Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Second Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I Schedule I-Prop Description

EXHIBIT(S) - I Schedule I-Prop Description; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H Schedule H-90 day demands

EXHIBIT(S) - H Schedule H-90 day demands; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Schedule G-Chart

EXHIBIT(S) - G Schedule G-Chart; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Schedule F-Assignment

EXHIBIT(S) - F Schedule F-Assignment; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Schedule E-Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - E Schedule E-Mortgage; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Schedule D-Note

EXHIBIT(S) - D Schedule D-Note; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule C-Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule C-Mortgage; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B-Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B-Parties; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A-Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A-Parties; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO OTHER OCCUPANTS AT THE PROPERTY; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRACY STORER SHA MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN L STRAVATO II; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRACY STORER SHA MARY ROE #1 1303 MAILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN L. STRAVATO II 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Second Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I Schedule I-Prop Description; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Schedule H-90 day demands; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Schedule G-Chart; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Schedule F-Assignment; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Schedule E-Mortgage; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Schedule D-Note; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule C-Mortgage; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B-Parties; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A-Parties; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less