This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:25:09 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC v. AMY BIVONA et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AMY BIVONA. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

Amy Bivona

Isaac Bivona

CLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ AAO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ AAO; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - iv (Motion #003) Short Form Order to Substitute Referee

EXHIBIT(S) - iv (Motion #003) Short Form Order to Substitute Referee; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ AMY BIVONA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ AMY BIVONA; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) CZM 20171424

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) CZM 20171424; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) Attorney Fee Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) Attorney Fee Affirmation; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ AMY BIVONA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ AMY BIVONA; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - ii (Motion #003) 255 & 258A Tax Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - ii (Motion #003) 255 & 258A Tax Affidavit; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #003) Secretary's Certification

EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #003) Secretary's Certification; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - Ti (Motion #003) Loan Modification

EXHIBIT(S) - Ti (Motion #003) Loan Modification; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #003) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #003) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #003) Power of Attorney with Pooling and Servicing Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #003) Power of Attorney with Pooling and Servicing Agreement; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - iii (Motion #003) Filed Notice of Withdrawal

EXHIBIT(S) - iii (Motion #003) Filed Notice of Withdrawal; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) CZM 20171424; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - iv (Motion #003) Short Form Order to Substitute Referee; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - iii (Motion #003) Filed Notice of Withdrawal; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - ii (Motion #003) 255 & 258A Tax Affidavit; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Ti (Motion #003) Loan Modification; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #003) Secretary's Certification; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #003) Power of Attorney with Pooling and Servicing Agreement; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) Attorney Fee Affirmation; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #003) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #003) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ AAO; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ AMY BIVONA; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ AMY BIVONA; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less