This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 19:01:06 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY v. WILLIAM G. BENNETT et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAM G BENNETT. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is _ Cp Part, Cp Part. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

Judge Details

Judge

_ Cp Part, Cp Part

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Madison Bennett

William G. Bennett AKA WILLIAM GARRETT BENNETT

Rosa P. Bennett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

Attorney at Schiller Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

VOGT, MEGAN CAROLINE

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

RUUSKA, RYAN E

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLP

BARRINGER, JASON DENNIS

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Herzel, LL

CANTERBURY, IAN THOMAS

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

LEFKOWITZ, GARY ALAN

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM G. BENNETT 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM G. BENNETT 3215; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSA P. BENNETT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSA P. BENNETT; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM G. BENNETT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM G. BENNETT; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd NOP

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd NOP; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSA P. BENNETT 3215; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM G. BENNETT 3215; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSA P. BENNETT; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM G. BENNETT; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd NOP; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less