This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 23:09:03 (UTC).

Barry Crupi v. Zareena Rashid et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Barry Crupi filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Zareena Rashid. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine M Didomenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine M Didomenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barry Crupi

Defendants

Edward Delli paoli

Zareena Rashid

Syed Rashid

Mustafa Rashid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILE, HOWARD M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HOWARD M. FILE, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

BERG, STUART ROBERT

Attorney at STUART R BERG PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #001)

ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Berg, S.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Electronic Filing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Electronic Filing; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT Corrected Affidavit of Service on Edward Delli Paoli

AFFIDAVIT Corrected Affidavit of Service on Edward Delli Paoli; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Edward Delli Paoli

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Edward Delli Paoli; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Mustafa Rashid

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Mustafa Rashid; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Syed Rashid

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Syed Rashid; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Zareena Rashid

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Zareena Rashid; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 247 Koch Blvd. SI, NY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 247 Koch Blvd. SI, NY; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 956-960 Richmond Ave., SI NY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 956-960 Richmond Ave., SI NY; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 101 Guyon Ave, SI, NY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 101 Guyon Ave, SI, NY; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Berg, S.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Electronic Filing; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Copy of Judgment; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Berg, S.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Corrected Affidavit of Service on Edward Delli Paoli; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Edward Delli Paoli; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Mustafa Rashid; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Syed Rashid; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Zareena Rashid; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY 247 Koch Blvd. SI, NY; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY 956-960 Richmond Ave., SI NY; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY 101 Guyon Ave, SI, NY; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: File, H.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less