This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 04/23/2020 at 02:58:14 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE - v. - SHARON A CONWAY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHARON A CONWAY. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0333

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

Sharon A Conway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT D87C811147 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT D87C811147 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

 

Docket Entries

08/13/2018
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT D87C811147 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less