This case was last updated from Monroe County New York Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:59:06 (UTC).

Barbara Johnson et al v. Companion Care of Rochester, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 Barbara Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Companion Care of Rochester, Inc. This case was filed in Monroe County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0715

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barbara Johnson

Shacora Fisher

Defendant

Companion Care of Rochester, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBINO, ANGELO SALVATORE

Defendant Attorney

APTER, JULIE PASQUARIELLO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel/Preclude

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel/Preclude; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Defendant's Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Defendant's Demands; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Letter dated 9/11/17

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Letter dated 9/11/17; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Letter dated 10/11/17

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Letter dated 10/11/17; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Certificate of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Certificate of Service; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed So Ordered Stipulation to Substitute Plaintiff

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed So Ordered Stipulation to Substitute Plaintiff; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

ORDER - OTHER Stipulated Order to Substitute Plaintiff

ORDER - OTHER Stipulated Order to Substitute Plaintiff; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Stipulated Order to Substitute Plaintiff; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed So Ordered Stipulation to Substitute Plaintiff; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Sensitive; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Certificate of Service; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Letter dated 10/11/17; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Letter dated 9/11/17; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Defendant's Demands; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel/Preclude; Filed By: Apter, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service COMPANION CARE OF ROCHESTER, INC.; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer APTER, JULIE PASQUARIELLO