This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 10/25/2020 at 05:27:18 (UTC).

Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC v. Harvey B. Garrison d/b/a Harvey B. Garrison, D.D.S. et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Harvey B Garrison d/b/a Harvey B Garrison, D D S. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald A Greenwood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald A Greenwood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC

Defendants

Harvey B. Garrison d/b/a Harvey B. Garrison, D.D.S.

Harvey B Garrison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALI, CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Attorney at BANKERS HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC.

Defendant Attorney

FUNDARO, CASEY ANTHONY

Attorney at MUNAWAR & ANDREWS-SANTILLO

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Motion Rules-submission

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Motion Rules-submission; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Out of State Florida Caselaw

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Out of State Florida Caselaw; Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) return date 11/23/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) return date 11/23/2020; Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Motion Rules-submission; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Out of State Florida Caselaw; Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) return date 11/23/2020; Filed By: Fundaro, C.; Filed: 10/19/2020; Received: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less