This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 17:16:05 (UTC).

Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC v. Harlan R. Knight d/b/a Harlan Knight, D.M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Harlan R Knight d/b/a Harlan Knight, D M D. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC

Defendants

Harlan R Knight

Harlan R. Knight d/b/a Harlan Knight, D.M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALI, CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Attorney at Bankers Healthcare Group, Inc

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT Judgment Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT Judgment Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - HARLAN R. KNIGHT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - HARLAN R. KNIGHT; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Judgment Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT D/B/A HARLAN KNIGHT, D.M.D; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - HARLAN R. KNIGHT; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - HARLAN R. KNIGHT; Filed By: Cali, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cali, C.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less