This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 11/18/2021 at 03:32:15 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-8 v. ANY KNOWN HEIRS TO THE ESTATE OF OLGA RYBICKY, NEXT OF KIN, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, DISTRIBUTEES, GRANT

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 BANK OF NEW YORK MELON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS, INC , ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-8 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY KNOWN HEIRS TO THE ESTATE OF OLGA RYBICKY, NEXT OF KIN, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, DISTRIBUTEES, GRANT. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick F Macrae. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2098

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Patrick F Macrae

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-8

Defendants

MAIN STREET AQUISITION CORP. A/P/O CREDIT ONE;

Lucille A Soldato COMMISSIONER, ONEIDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES;

Daniel Rybicky AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF OLGA RYBICKI

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE;

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A.;

Glenn Rybicki AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF OLGA RYBICKY AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF OLGA RYBICKY, IF LIVING, AND IF HE BE DEAD, HIS RESPECTIVE HEIRS-AT-LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DISTRIBUTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, TRUSTEES, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENO

ANY KNOWN HEIRS TO THE ESTATE OF OLGA RYBICKY, NEXT OF KIN, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, DISTRIBUTEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, TRUSTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS OF SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF THE AFORESAID CLASSES OF PERSONS, IF THEY OR ANY O

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREMAROLI, ROBERT STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

LASCURETTES, TOD MARCEL

 

Court Documents

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2015; Received: 02/04/2021

APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING

APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2015; Received: 02/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Conversion with AOS

PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Conversion with AOS; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

NOTICE OF ENTRY of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order to Conform Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order to Conform Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Order to Conform Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Conversion with AOS; Filed By: Tremaroli, R.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2015; Received: 02/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2015; Received: 02/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less