This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 22:06:57 (UTC).

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A. v. Richard T Nemcek et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co , N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Richard T Nemcek. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Oliver N Blaise Iii. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0248

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Oliver N Blaise Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AS TRUSTEE OF MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT SERIES 1 TRUST

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A. as Trustee of Mortgage Assets Management Series 1 Trust

Defendants

Madeleine Nemcek

Broome County Clerk

Richard T Nemcek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIOTT, VANESSA REEVE

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP FOR FIDELITY NATIONAL FINANCIAL, INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1)

ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - NOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - NOE; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/03/2021; Received: 05/03/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - Court Notice to Defendants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - Court Notice to Defendants; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/08/2021; Received: 04/08/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Richard Nemcek

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Richard Nemcek; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F *Corrected* 2007 Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - F *Corrected* 2007 Mortgage; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E *Corrected* 2008 HUD1A

EXHIBIT(S) - E *Corrected* 2008 HUD1A; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D *Corrected* Tax Map of Lot 13

EXHIBIT(S) - D *Corrected* Tax Map of Lot 13; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C *Corrected* 2007 Loan Application

EXHIBIT(S) - C *Corrected* 2007 Loan Application; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B *Corrected* 2008 Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - B *Corrected* 2008 Mortgage; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Correct Legal

EXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Correct Legal; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/23/2021; Received: 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - NOE; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/03/2021; Received: 05/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - Court Notice to Defendants; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/08/2021; Received: 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Form of Order granting Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Madeleine Nemcek; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Richard Nemcek; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F *Corrected* 2007 Mortgage; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E *Corrected* 2008 HUD1A; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D *Corrected* Tax Map of Lot 13; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C *Corrected* 2007 Loan Application; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B *Corrected* 2008 Mortgage; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Correct Legal; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Elliott, V.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less