This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 15:22:40 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA v. RIVKA EINHORN

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against RIVKA EINHORN. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

Rivka Einhorn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 12, 2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 12, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT RIVKA EINHORN

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT RIVKA EINHORN; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 12, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT RIVKA EINHORN; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less